Mildon, Catherine Anne (CPSO#: 23128)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 15 Jul 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 15 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]

            As from July 15, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Catherine Anne
            Mildon, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mildon to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Effective July 15, 2017, Dr. Mildon has ceased practicing medicine until
                  such time as she obtains a College-approved clinical supervisor.
                  
            As from June 14, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Catherine Anne
            Mildon, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mildon to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. CATHERINE ANNE MILDON
                                          ("Dr. Mildon")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Mildon, certificate of registration number 23128, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Mildon, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7214453 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in the practice of
                  medicine.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Mildon, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mildon, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for at least ten (10) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mildon, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum:
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  High-level supervision: For a period of a minimum of one (1)
                              month, the Clinical Supervisor will engage in a period of
                              high-level supervision, during which time:
                  
                              i.    I shall not be the Most Responsible Physician ("MRP")
                                    for any patient.  For clarity, I shall not conduct
                                    patient assessments or reassessments, or approve
                                    patients for hyperbaric oxygen chamber treatment in the
                                    absence of the Clinical Supervisor.  For further
                                    clarity, I am permitted to be the only physician on
                                    site during the course of the hyperbaric oxygen chamber
                                    treatments themselves, and Ontario HBOT is permitted to
                                    bill those treatments to OHIP in my name;
                  
                              ii.   the Clinical Supervisor will directly observe my care
                                    and treatment of all patients.
                  
                        (iii) After the first month of my Clinical Supervision, and at the
                              end of every month thereafter for so long as the period of
                              high-level supervision continues, the Clinical Supervisor
                              shall submit a report to the College, and shall reconsider
                              the need for high-level supervision.  If the Clinical
                              Supervisor believes that I am ready to practise under
                              moderate supervision, he/she shall provide the College with a
                              report addressing the practise concerns raised in the report
                              of the Medical Inspector, dated June 1, 2016.  The College
                              must agree to the transition to the next phase, based on the
                              report(s) of the Clinical Supervisor;
                  
                        (iv)  Moderate-level supervision: For a period of a further three
                              (3) months, the Clinical Supervisor will engage in a period
                              of moderate-level supervision, during which time the Clinical
                              Supervisor will:
                  
                              i.    meet with me at my Practice Location, or another
                                    location approved by the College, on a monthly basis
                                    to:
                  
                                    1.    review a minimum of twenty (20) of my patient
                                          records and discuss any issues or concerns
                                          arising therefrom;
                  
                                    2.    discuss any concerns the Clinical Supervisor may
                                          have arising from the chart reviews; and
                  
                              ii.   submit a report to the College every month.
                  
                        (v)   Low-level supervision: Following the period of moderate
                              supervision described in paragraph B(5)(b)(iv) above,
                              provided that the Clinical Supervisor and the College agree
                              that the level of supervision can be reduced, for a further
                              six months, at a minimum, the Clinical Supervisor will engage
                              in a period of low-level supervision, during which time the
                              Clinical Supervisor will:
                  
                              i.    meet with me at my Practice Location, or another
                                    location approved by the College, on a monthly basis
                                    to:
                  
                                    1.    review a minimum of twenty (20) of my patient
                                          records and discuss any issues or concerns
                                          arising therefrom; and
                  
                                    2.    discuss any concerns the Clinical Supervisor may
                                          have arising from the chart reviews or the direct
                                          observations; and
                  
                              ii.   submit a report to the College once every three (3)
                                    months.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Mildon, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the
                        medical inspector dated June 1, 2016, and concerns that may arise
                        during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Mildon, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Mildon, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Mildon, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Mildon, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Mildon, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mildon, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in: 
                  
                              1.    prescribing;
                  
                              2.    advertising;
                  
                              3.    medical record keeping; and
                  
                              4.    ethics and boundaries. 
                  
                        (ii)  individualized instruction in medical ethics and
                              professionalism satisfactory to the College, with an
                              instructor selected by the College; and
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mildon, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Mildon, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Mildon, undertake to complete this requirement by February
                        2018 or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mildon, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mildon, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Mildon, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Mildon, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of the
                        Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have thirty
                        (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within which
                        to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Mildon, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (7)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Mildon, hereby consent to the following being included on
                        the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (7)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (8)   Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mildon, undertake that I shall post a sign in the waiting
                        room(s) of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and
                        secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "E" for the
                        duration of the period of high-level supervision.  For further
                        clarity, this sign shall state as follows: "For a period of at
                        least one month, and until further notice, Dr. Mildon must not
                        engage in the care or treatment of any patients in the absence of
                        her Clinical Supervisor.  Further information may be found on the
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
                        www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mildon, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in any
                        language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (8)(a) in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice Locations,
                        in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
                        Appendix "E" .
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Mildon, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (8)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Mildon, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Mildon, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (8)(b) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in the language(s) described in section (8)(d).
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mildon, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mildon, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Mildon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, if relevant, add: NMS and/or any
                        person who or institution that may have relevant information, in
                        order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions
                        of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Mildon, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Mildon, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Mildon, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Mildon, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Mildon, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Mildon, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (15)  I, Dr. Mildon, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mildon, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mildon, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Mildon
                              engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in
                              the practice of medicine.  As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr. Mildon will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 10
                                    months, including a period of at least one month in
                                    which Dr. Mildon may not be the Most Responsible
                                    Physician for any patient. 
                  
                              *     Dr. Mildon will engage in professional education in
                                    prescribing, advertising, medical record keeping, and
                                    ethics and professionalism.
                  
                              *     Dr. Mildon's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within 6 months of the end of
                                    the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Mildon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Mildon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Mildon, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  
                  
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 14, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Catherine Anne Mildon to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 14, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Mildon engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of medicine. As a result of the investigation:

- Dr. Mildon will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 10 months, including a period of at least one month in which Dr. Mildon may not be the Most Responsible Physician for any patient.

- Dr. Mildon will engage in professional education in prescribing, advertising, medical record keeping, and ethics and professionalism.

- Dr. Mildon’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.