Milenkovic, Svetlana (CPSO#: 64286)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 407
2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 3A6
Phone: (416) 516-6337
Fax: (416) 516-0073
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Svetlana Milenkovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Milenkovic ( CPSO# 64286 )

Business Address:
Suite 407
2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 3A6
Phone Number: (416) 516-6337

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SVETLANA MILENKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILENKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Feb 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1999