Miles, John Taylor (CPSO#: 22869)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 9 Fairvalley Street Brampton ON L6R 0W2
Date Received: 12 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016