Miletin, Michael Solomon (CPSO#: 70342)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Apr 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6175 Highway 7
Units 19-22
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Phone: (416) 297-8362
Fax: 416-840-8434
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 24 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL SOLOMON MILETIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILETIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2001