Milio, Hany Shawky (CPSO#: 69836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Westheights Drive
Suite 201
Kitchener ON  N2N 2A8
Phone: (519) 578-5555
Fax: (519) 578-5551
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milio & Ghally Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Milio ( CPSO# 69836 )
Dr. G. Ghally ( CPSO# 69864 )

Business Address:
201 - 10 Westheights Drive
Kitchener ON  N2N 2A8
Phone Number: (519) 578-5555

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANY SHAWKY MILIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILIO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Feb 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 1999 to 31 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1999