Milkovic, Zeke (CPSO#: 62363)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
20 Emma Street
Chatham ON  N7L 5K5
Phone: (519) 354-5290
Fax: (519) 354-9011
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milkovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Milkovic ( CPSO# 56815 )
Dr. Z. Milkovic ( CPSO# 62363 )

Business Address:
103 - 20 Emma Street
Chatham ON  N7L 5K5
Phone Number: (519) 354-5290

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZEKE MILKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1991