Milkovich, Daniel Joseph (CPSO#: 67156)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Oct 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2010