Milkovich, Robert Matthew (CPSO#: 69284)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: 519-941-2410 Ext. 2232
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

35 Giles Rd
Caledon ON  L7K 0B7
Canada
Phone: (416) 567-8079
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Headwaters Healthcare Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Canada
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Wojtasik Milkovich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Milkovich ( CPSO# 69284 )
Dr. Z. Wojtasik ( CPSO# 52455 )

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9

Business Address:
35 Giles Road
Caledon ON  L7K 0B7

Business Address:
SPH6 - 1 Aberfoyle Crescent
Toronto ON  M8X 2X8

Business Address:
1654 Bayshire Road
Oakville ON  L6H 4X7


Corporation Name: Dr. R.M. Milkovich, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Milkovich ( CPSO# 69284 )

Business Address:
Headwaters Healthcare Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MATTHEW MILKOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILKOVICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1997