Millar, Adam Christopher (CPSO#: 84395)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: Millar, Adam (used until: 16 Jul 2006 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6th Floor
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 3939
Fax: (416) 586-4685
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam C. Millar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Millar ( CPSO# 84395 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
6th Floor
60 Murray Street
Box 19
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM CHRISTOPHER MILLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010