Millar, Barbara-Ann McLellan (CPSO#: 76807)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sheffield, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2936
Fax: (416) 946-2227
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara-Ann Millar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Millar ( CPSO# 76807 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2121

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 14 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA-ANN MCLELLAN MILLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 28 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2007