Millar-Book, Wendy Denise (CPSO#: 65154)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
23 Main Street South
Waterford ON  N0E 1Y0
Phone: (519) 443-6694
Fax: (519) 443-6829
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY DENISE MILLAR-BOOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLAR-BOOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 17 Feb 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993