Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Miller, Barry Alan (CPSO#: 57771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
13390 Lanoue Street, Unit D
Tecumseh ON  N8N 5E1
Phone: (519) 956-9655
Fax: (519) 968-1177
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.A. Miller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Miller ( CPSO# 57771 )

Business Address:
Unit D
13390 Lanoue Street
Tecumseh ON  N8N 5E1
Phone Number: (519) 956-9655

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARRY ALAN MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1986
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 12 Apr 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2008

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Apr 2001
Summary:

On April 5, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Miller s guilty plea and found him 
guilty of professional misconduct in that the governing body of a health profession in a 
jurisdiction other than Ontario has found that Dr. Miller committed an act of professional 
misconduct.  
 
Subsequently, on April 11, 2001, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Miller s certificate 
of registration be revoked. 
 
The Discipline Committee considered an application for reinstatement by Dr. Barry Alan Miller 
on September 27 and 28, 2004.  The Committee directs the Registrar to issue a certificate of 
registration to the applicant, Dr. Barry Alan Miller, subject to the following terms and conditions: 
 
   1.    Dr. Miller s practice will be restricted to a hospital or institutional setting agreeable to 
         the College; 
    
   2.    Dr. Miller will successfully complete the following re-entry to practice program (the 
         Program ) at his own expense: 
 
         a)    For a period of twelve (12) months following the date of this Order, Dr. 
               Miller s practice will be supervised by two monitors acceptable to the College 
               (the Monitors ), in accordance with the undertakings hereto attached, 
 
         b)    Throughout the term of the Program, the Monitors will submit a written report 
               to the Registrar every three (3) months regarding Dr. Miller s competence and 
               behaviour, which reports will specifically address the following: 
 
                (i)   The objectives of the Program approved by the College at its outset; 
                 
                (ii)  The Monitors  impression of Dr. Miller s general medical 
                      knowledge, including use of current diagnostics and therapeutics; 
                 
                 
                (iii) The Monitors  impression of Dr. Miller s clinical skills, including: 
 
                           History-taking 
                           Examination 
                           Problem formulation 
                           Communication and interviewing skills 
                           Record-keeping practices 
                           Relevant technical skills 
                         
                         
                (iv)  the Monitors  impression of Dr. Miller s judgment, behaviour and 
                      attitude in the provision of patient care including Dr. Miller s 
                      interaction with patients, colleagues and co-workers; 
              
             (v)   whether Dr. Miller meets the standard of practice expected of a 
                   psychiatrist in Ontario; 
              
             (vi)  if indicated, suggested enhancement, remedial or educational 
                   activities which may be of assistance to Dr. Miller; and 
              
             (vii) if indicated, the areas of practice that should be monitored and/or 
                   re-evaluated; 
              
      (c) at the conclusion of the Program, the Monitors shall submit a final report to the 
         College regarding Dr. Miller s overall performance and identifying whether Dr. 
         Miller is ready for independent practice or whether further supervision or 
         retraining is required; 
    
3.    If any of the reports required in connection with the Program are not delivered or are 
      unsatisfactory to the College, the College may suspend Dr. Miller s certificate of 
      registration; 
 
4.    Dr. Miller will take and successfully complete the College s record-keeping course, at 
      his expense, within one year following the date of this Order; 
 
5.    Dr. Miller will undergo a Specialties Assessment Program (SAP), at his expense, 
      within the second year following the date of this Order; 
 
6.    Following the successful completion of the record-keeping course, the SAP, and the 
      Program, to the satisfaction of the Registrar, the Registrar shall remove the foregoing 
      terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Miller s certificate of registration. 
              
 
7.    If at the conclusion of the Program, the Monitors are of the opinion that Dr. Miller is 
      not ready for unsupervised practice, or requires further retraining or supervision, then 
      until the recommended period of retraining and supervision are completed, it will be a 
      term, condition and limitation of Dr. Miller s certificate of registration that: 
 
             (i)   he shall continue to practice only under supervision of the Monitors 
              
             (ii)  he shall continue to practice only in an institutional setting approved 
                   by the College. 
              
8.    In the event that Dr. Miller is unsuccessful in the completion of the record-keeping 
      course, the SAP, or the Program, as determined by the Registrar, or if his certificate of 
      registration is suspended pursuant to paragraph 3 of this Order, the Discipline 
      Committee retains jurisdiction on the application of a party, to vary the terms and 
      conditions of this Order, including to order the Registrar to suspend Dr. Miller s 
certificate of registration. 
                 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 05, 2001

Application for Reinstatement   Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
Decision Date: 28 Sep 2004
Decision: Application Accepted