Miller, Christine Anne (CPSO#: 63863)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1992

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Names: Miller-Hart, Christine Anne (used until: 04 Apr 2012 )     Miller, Christine Anne (used until: 06 Dec 1992 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sauble Family Heath Team
672B Main Street
Sauble Beach ON  N0H 2G0
Phone: (519) 422-1321
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Hart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Miller ( CPSO# 63863 )
Dr. B. Hart ( CPSO# 63710 )

Business Address:
25 Mill Street
Gananoque ON  K7G 3L5
Phone Number: (613) 382-2680

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  October 13, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On October 13, 2017, Providence Care notified the College, pursuant to s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that on September 6, 2017, Dr. Christine Miller resigned her privileges at Providence Care during the course of, or as a result of, an investigation by Providence Care into Dr. Miller’s professional conduct.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ANNE MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jul 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1992