Miller, Claire Lorraine Mercer (CPSO#: 68867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Site
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone: 905 732 6111 Ext. 57800
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.L.M. Miller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Miller ( CPSO# 68867 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Site
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAIRE LORRAINE MERCER MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1997