Miller, David Bruce (CPSO#: 58286)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 2003