Miller, Fraser Alexander (CPSO#: 58778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-4700 Ext. 2515
Fax: (613) 721-2582
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fraser Miller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Miller ( CPSO# 58778 )

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRASER ALEXANDER MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1989