Miller, Garfield Lincoln Alexander (CPSO#: 82955)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Eye Institute
Box 307
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 72820
Fax: (613) 737-8065
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Garfield Miller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Miller ( CPSO# 82955 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Eye Institute
General Campus
Box 307
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 739-8899

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARFIELD LINCOLN ALEXANDER MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010