Miller, Hensley Arthur Basil (CPSO#: 24508)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 12 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of West Indies, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking for a copy of their records should send a written request to: Academic Clinicians Management Services/Health Data Resources Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto, ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 15 Sep 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2009