Miller, James Lance (CPSO#: 23598)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
1st Floor
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone: (613) 432-3881
Fax: (613) 432-8649
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES LANCE MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Nov 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Nov 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1974