Miller, Judith Ann (CPSO#: 52428)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Judith A. Miller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 22 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Christopher Chan, 8N, Toronto General Hospital, 585 University Avenue, Toronto, ON M5G 2N2
Date Received: 06 Aug 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 09 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2015