Miller, Katherine Judith (CPSO#: 70075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
85 Norfolk St, No 305
Guelph ON  N1H 4J2
Phone: 519 836-9440
Fax: (519) 836-9530
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

115 Delhi St
Guelph ON  N1E4J4
Canada
Phone: 519 822-5350
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

115 Delhi St
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: 519 822-5350
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Katherine J. Miller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Miller ( CPSO# 70075 )

Business Address:
Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Phone Number: (519) 291-3210

Business Address:
Suite 305
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J2
Phone Number: (519) 766-1490

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE JUDITH MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998