Miller, Kevin Francis (CPSO#: 68920)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Cancer Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-7310
Fax: (807) 684-5805
Electoral District: 09
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Regional Health Sciences Centre
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (809) 684-7310
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

St. Joseph's Hospital
35 Algoma St. N.,
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Canada
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. F. Miller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Miller ( CPSO# 68920 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-7200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN FRANCIS MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1998