Miller, Kimberley Lauren (CPSO#: 68304)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
Room 16 - 710
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2897
Fax: (416) 946-2047
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY LAUREN MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2006