Miller, Murray Howard (CPSO#: 51448)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Radiology Associates Dundix
Suite 302
1370 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4G4
Phone: (416) 231-3369
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1020 Johnson's Lane, Bldg. C.
Mississauga ON  L5J 2P7
Canada
Phone: 4162313369
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

123 Rexdale Boulevard, Unit 6
Rexdale ON  M9W 1P1
Canada
Phone: 4162313369
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Canada
Phone: 705-445-2550
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: (416) 521-4103
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3025 Hurontario Street, Suite 402
Mississauga ON  L5A 2H1
Canada
Phone: 4162313369
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

85 The East Mall, Lower Level
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5W4
Canada
Phone: (416) 231-3369
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Murray Miller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Miller ( CPSO# 51448 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Business Address:
Radiology Associates Dundix
Suite 302
1370 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4G4
Phone Number: (416) 231-3369

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre - West Toronto
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5

Business Address:
Radiology Associates Etobicoke
LF01 - 85 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone Number: (416) 621-3961

Business Address:
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 444-0019

Business Address:
Radiology Associates Clarkson
1020 Johnson's Lane
Building C
Mississauga ON  L5J 2P7

Business Address:
Radiology Associates Mississauga
402 - 3025 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5A 2H1

Business Address:
Radiology Associates Rexdale
6 - 123 Rexdale Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 1P1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MURRAY HOWARD MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1983