Miller, Naomi Anne (CPSO#: 51204)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
University Health Network
11th Floor
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3738
Fax: (416) 340-5517
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAOMI ANNE MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1984