Miller, Robert Taylor (CPSO#: 25948)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Iroqois Falls Family Health Team
58A Anson Drive
Iroquois Falls ON  P0K 1E0
Phone: (705) 258-2818
Fax: (705) 258-2828
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert T. Miller and Dr. Cheri E.H. Bethune Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Miller ( CPSO# 25948 )
Dr. C. Bethune ( CPSO# 50148 )

Business Address:
58A Anson Drive
Iroquois Falls ON  P0K 1E0
Phone Number: (705) 258-3911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site Moosonee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT TAYLOR MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2015