Miller, Stephen Franklin (CPSO#: 65810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Vanderbilt University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6026
Fax: (416) 813-7591
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5M 1X8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Tennessee
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 May 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN FRANKLIN MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2000