Miller, Thomas Allen (CPSO#: 60736)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
St Mary's Hospital Dept Of Pm & R
21 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 1Y6
Phone: (519) 646-6100 Ext. 65364
Fax: (519) 646-6174
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas A. Miller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Miller ( CPSO# 60736 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
St. Mary's Hospital Department of Pm & R
21 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 1Y6
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS ALLEN MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1990