Milligan, James Duncan (CPSO#: 86353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Centre for Family Medicine
10 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone: (519) 783-0022
Fax: (519) 783-0032
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Milligan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Milligan ( CPSO# 86353 )

Business Address:
10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 783-0022

Business Address:
The Centre for Family Medicine
Department of Family Medicine
25 Joseph Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 4X6
Phone Number: (519) 578-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES DUNCAN MILLIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLIGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009