Millington, Scott Jeffrey (CPSO#: 84115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Road
Box 207
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79830
Fax: (613) 737-8890
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Scott Millington Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Millington ( CPSO# 84115 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Box 207
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT JEFFREY MILLINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLINGTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 Apr 2006 to 28 Apr 2006
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008