Millman, Christine Gardiner (CPSO#: 68181)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Westmount Rd
Guelph ON  N1H 5H8
Phone: 519-824-6000 Ext. 4441
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE GARDINER MILLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1996