Mills, Douglas Vernor Mackley (CPSO#: 12680)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Jan 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1948

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 27 Nov 1953 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1948
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jan 1992