Mills, Heather Elaine (CPSO#: 67023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 216-6985
Fax: (613) 695-1870
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Mills Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mills ( CPSO# 67023 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 216-6985

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER ELAINE MILLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2003