Mills, Jessica Louise Alexandra (CPSO#: 87837)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Surgery Effective: 28 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2007 to 25 Nov 2007
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 26 Nov 2007 to 17 Dec 2007
Elective Trainee - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2007