Mills, Jonathan Denis (CPSO#: 102564)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Hawkesbury General Hospital 1111 Ghislain St, Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 18 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017