Mills, Kelsey Erin (CPSO#: 90843)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 280 Wilfert Road Victoria, BC V9C 1A3
Date Received: 04 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016