Mills, Melissa Marilyn (CPSO#: 97978)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 576-2992
Fax: (519) 576-7650
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melissa Mills Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mills ( CPSO# 97978 )

Business Address:
204 - 430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 576-2992

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA MARILYN MILLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014