Mills, Michael James (CPSO#: 29906)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 May 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 May 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton McMaster Family Health
Centre
1221 Lakeshore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1A8
Phone: 905-333-8222
Fax: 905-333-9343
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M J Mills Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mills ( CPSO# 29906 )

Business Address:
1221 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A1
Phone Number: (905) 333-8222

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES MILLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1978