Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Mills, Natalie Shirley (CPSO#: 63528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 May 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2246 Laurier Street
Suite 203
P O Box 479
Rockland ON  K4K 1K5
Phone: (613) 446-6401
Fax: (613) 446-6951
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Natalie Mills Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mills ( CPSO# 63528 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
2246 Laurier Street
P.O. Box 479
Rockland ON  K4K 1K5
Phone Number: (613) 446-6401

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE SHIRLEY MILLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 1991