Mills, William George (CPSO#: 32504)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 12 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017