Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Mills-Tettey, Diana Barbara (CPSO#: 56062)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Univ of Ghana, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 503-504
North York ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 226-4294
Fax: (416) 226-1928
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diana Barbara Mills-Tettey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mills-Tettey ( CPSO# 56062 )

Business Address:
Suite 503
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 226-4294

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANA BARBARA MILLS-TETTEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLS-TETTEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1989