Millson, Richard Case (CPSO#: 30812)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 217-7058
Fax: (613) 767-3571
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

304 - 837 Princess St.
Kingston ON  K7L 1G8
Canada
Phone: (613) 217-7058
Fax: (613) 767-3571
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD CASE MILLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Nov 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1996