Milman, Nataliya (CPSO#: 84542)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
Division of Rheumatology
1967 Riverside Drive Box 37
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 81871
Fax: (613) 738-8488
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Milman ( CPSO# 84542 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
Department of Rheumatology
1967 Riverside Drive
Suite 6-18
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 27 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIYA MILMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 8 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2011