Milne, David Gordon (CPSO#: 65675)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 2003