Milne, Gordon William (CPSO#: 27805)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Nov 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Nov 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 17 May 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Nov 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 4, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gordon William Milne to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 23, 2016:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Milne's knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Milne was required to complete a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program ("SCERP"). Prior to starting the SCERP, Dr. Milne resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

See PDF for full undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: QA Committee
Active Date: September 22, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

SCERP Summary:

On September 22, 2016, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required hospitalist physician, Dr. Gordon William Milne, to complete a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Milne to:

•Practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 9 months
•Attend and successfully complete the medical record-keeping course offered at the University of Toronto
•Provide a written summary of the following policies, guidelines, or tools with reference to how his hospitalist practice will change as a result:
-2016 Hypertension Canada CHEP Guidelines (Annual Update)
-Chronic Kidney Disease in Adults- Assessment and Management (NICE Guideline)
-Chronic Heart Failure Diagnosis and Management
-American Geriatric Society 2015 updated Beers Criteria for inappropriate medication use in older adults
-CPSO Medical Records policy
-CPSO Planning for and Providing End-of-Life Care Policy
-Healthcare Consent Advance Care Planning Ontario Toolkit: Advice and Guidance on Best Practices
•Undergo a reassessment with an assessor selected by the College, approximately three months following the completion of the Education Plan