Milne, William Kenneth (CPSO#: 69505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone: (519) 235-2700 Ext. 5183
Fax: 519-235-4888
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Kenneth Milne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Milne ( CPSO# 69505 )

Business Address:
146 Oliver Raod
Campbellcroft ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-6551

Business Address:
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 371-7695

Business Address:
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Business Address:
340 High Street
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 797-3230

Business Address:
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Business Address:
24 Huron Street West
Goderich ON  N0M 1S2
Phone Number: (519) 535-2700

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
27 Bruce Street West
Goderich ON  N7A 2M5
Phone Number: (519) 524-4121

Business Address:
1-H Manor Lane
PO Box 157
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0

Business Address:
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM KENNETH MILNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997