Milone, Stephanie Marian Lopes (CPSO#: 78012)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone: (519) 941-2702
Fax: (519) 941-8981
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Milone ( CPSO# 78012 )
Dr. S. Milone ( CPSO# 77963 )

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone Number: (519) 941-2702

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE MARIAN LOPES MILONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2004