Milosevic, Lawrence Martin (CPSO#: 64050)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Milosevic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Milosevic ( CPSO# 64050 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE MARTIN MILOSEVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILOSEVIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1992