Milroy, Connie Lynne (CPSO#: 33521)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
723 Rymal Road West
Hamilton ON  L9B 2W2
Phone: (905) 575-5200
Fax: (905) 575-5383
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CONNIE LYNNE MILROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILROY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Oct 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1987