Mimesh, Samara Ahmed Ali (CPSO#: 78409)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 28 Jul 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 28 Jul 2006
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2006